SC H4863 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of Exodus Drive In Georgetown County (south Carolina Highway #s-264), Beginning With Its Intersection At North Fraser Street (united States Highway 701), Spanning Approximately 7.97 Miles, And Ending At A Second Intersection With United States Highway 701 "johnny Morant Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway Containing These Words.
Title
Johnny Morant Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-30 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2024-01-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced |