SC H4858 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Act No. 141
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Act No. 141
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designate The Twenty-first Day Of October Of Each Year As "dr. Ronald Mcnair Day" In South Carolina
Title
Dr. Ronald McNair Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Act No. 141 | |
2018-03-14 | Effective date 03/12/18 | |
2018-03-12 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-03-07 | Ratified R 148 | |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Invitations |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Polled out of committee Invitations |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Invitations |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-14 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-13 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Anderson, McEachern, Govan |
2018-02-08 | House | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |