SC H4817 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Act No. 194
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Act No. 194
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Require An Applicant To Comply With All Licensing And Renewal Requirements And To Furnish A Complete Set Of Fingerprints To The Director And Undergo A State Criminal Records Check
Title
Bondsman or Runner License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | Act No. 194 | |
2016-06-01 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2016-05-26 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-05-24 | Ratified R 204 | |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-3 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-03-17 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-03-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2016-03-16 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-16 | House | Amended |
2016-03-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2016-02-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 43 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 43 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 45 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 45 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 47 | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 48 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 49 | 25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 53 | 95 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |