SC H4772 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Murphy
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Murphy
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 40-45-220, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Qualifications For Licensure By The Board Of Physical Therapy Examiners, And Section 40-45-240, Relating To Applicants For Licensure By Endorsement For Licensees From Other Jurisdictions, Both So As To Require Certain Fingerprint-supported State And National Criminal Records Checks For Initial Licensure Applicants, To Provide The Results Of These Records Checks Must Be Provided To The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation, To Authorize The State Law Enforcement Division To Retain Fingerprints For Certain Purposes, To Provide Applicants Must Bare Related Costs, And To Provide The Department Shall Keep Information Received Pursuant To This Act Confidential, Subject To An Exception.
Title
Physical Therapy Examiners; license qualifications
Sponsors
Rep. Phillip Lowe [R] | Rep. Joseph Daning [R] | Rep. William Cogswell [R] | Rep. Brandon Newton [R] |
Rep. Richard Martin [R] | Rep. Christopher Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Murphy |
2020-02-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning, Cogswell, B.Newton, Martin |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2019-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4772&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4772_20191211.htm |