SC H4743 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-13 - Act No. 132
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-13 - Act No. 132
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 4-3-312 So As To Alter The County Lines Of Horry And Georgetown Counties By Annexing A Certain Portion Of Georgetown To Horry County And To Make Provisions For Legal Records. - Ratified Title
Title
Horry and Georgetown county lines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-13 | Act No. 132 | |
2020-04-13 | Effective date 04/10/20 | |
2020-04-10 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-04-08 | Ratified R 137 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-46 Nays-0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2020-02-06 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2020-02-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-88 Nays-0 |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-11-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-11-20 | House | Prefiled |