SC H4737 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 50-21-870, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Personal Watercraft And Boating Safety, So As To Increase Distance Limits Between A Watercraft Operating In Excess Of Idle Speed Upon Certain Waters Of This State And A Moored Or Anchored Vessel, Wharf, Dock, Bulkhead, Pier, Or Person In The Water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Watercraft

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
2020-02-05SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-02-05HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2020-02-04HouseRoll call Yeas-105 Nays-4
2020-02-04HouseRead second time
2020-02-04HouseAmended
2020-02-04HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Calhoon
2020-01-30HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2020-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams, Jefferson
2020-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon, Hill
2020-01-15HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest, Wheeler
2020-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-11-20HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-11-20HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H4736 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5021870(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback