SC H4712 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Moore, McDaniel, S.Williams, Henderson-Myers, Robinson, Rivers, Thigpen
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Moore, McDaniel, S.Williams, Henderson-Myers, Robinson, Rivers, Thigpen
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "south Carolina Dignity In Pregnancy And Childbirth Act" By Adding Chapter 42 To Title 44 So As To Require Perinatal Health Care Providers To Implement An Evidence-based Implicit Bias Program To Train Health Care Staff, To Establish Requirements For The Program, And For Other Purposes.
Title
SC Dignity in Pregnancy and Childbirth Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Moore, McDaniel, S.Williams, Henderson-Myers, Robinson, Rivers, Thigpen |
2020-02-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams, Jefferson, Brawley, Howard, Henegan, Cobb-Hunter |
2020-02-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kimmons |
2020-02-18 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pendarvis |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-11-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2019-11-20 | House | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4712&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4712_20191120.htm |