SC H4710 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Sections 16-17-500 And 16-17-501, As Amended, And Sections 16-17-502, 16-17-503, 16-17-504, And 16-17-506, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, All Relating To The "youth Access To Tobacco Prevention Act Of 2006", So As To Make Technical Corrections; To Amend Section 44-95-20, As Amended, Relating To Certain Public Indoor Areas Where Smoking Is Prohibited In South Carolina, So As To Apply Also To The Use Of Vapor Products; And To Amend Section 59-1-380, Relating To The Mandatory Public School Comprehensive Tobacco-free Campus Policy, So As To Make Technical Corrections.
Title
Youth Access to Tobacco Prevention Act of 2006
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Bernstein [D] | Rep. Kirkman Finlay [R] | Rep. Gary Clary [R] | Rep. Neal Collins [R] |
Rep. Christopher Wooten [R] | Rep. Garry Smith [R] | Rep. William Clyburn [D] | Rep. Lonnie Hosey [D] |
Rep. Seth Rose [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-03-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-03-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-03-04 | House | Amended |
2020-03-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-11-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-11-20 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 17 | 500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 17 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 17 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 17 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 17 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 17 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 95 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 380 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |