SC H4680 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Herbkersman
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 22 To Chapter 3, Title 16 So As To Entitle The Article "penalty Enhancements For Certain Crimes", To Provide Additional Penalties For Persons Who Commit Certain Delineated Crimes When The Victim Was Intentionally Selected Based On Certain Factors, And To Provide Victims Of A Violation Of The Article May Bring A Civil Action For Damages Sustained.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Penalty Enhancements for Certain Crimes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Herbkersman
2020-01-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine
2020-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-11-20HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-11-20HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback