SC H4679 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 49-20)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Turner
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Turner
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibit Certain Actions By The Public Service Commission And Provide Exceptions, And To Define The Term "voice Service"; To Allow The Public Service Commission To Conduct An Investigation In Certain Circumstances When A Customer Files A Request For Voice Service With The Commission; And To Delineate The Commission's Actions Upon Conclusion Of The Investigation.
Title
Local exchange carrier and alternative forms of regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Turner |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-02-11 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2016-02-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-1 |
2016-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White, Knight, Henegan |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2016-02-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Funderburk, Hodges |
2016-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ryhal |
2016-01-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ott |
2016-01-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: H.A.Crawford, Mack |
2016-01-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kennedy, Howard |
2016-01-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Anthony, J.E.Smith |
2016-01-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hicks, Yow, Alexander, Hiott, Lowe, Finlay, Pitts, Horne, Rutherford, Bannister |
2016-01-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.A.Brown, Anderson |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2016-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |