SC H4628 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson, Hosey, Clyburn
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson, Hosey, Clyburn
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Chapter 56 To Title 46 So As To Regulate The Sale And Distribution Of Products Containing Hemp-derived Cannabinoid.
Title
Regulations for products containing Hemp-Derived Cannabinoids
Sponsors
Rep. Rosalyn Henderson-Myers [D] | Rep. Patricia Henegan [D] | Rep. Max Hyde [R] | Rep. Jermaine Johnson [D] |
Rep. Lonnie Hosey [D] | Rep. William Clyburn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson, Hosey, Clyburn |
2024-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hyde |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-11-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2023-11-16 | House | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4628&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/4628_20231116.htm |