SC H4602 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Also Require A Review Of Any Incidents In Which The Patient Has Been Administered An Opioid Antidote By A First Responder Or In An Emergency Health Care Setting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription monitoring program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 38) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2018-03-21SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-03-21HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2018-03-20HouseRoll call Yeas-78 Nays-0
2018-03-20HouseRead second time
2018-03-20HouseAmended
2018-03-09 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-03-08HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2018-01-10HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4413060(n/a)See Bill Text
4413070(n/a)See Bill Text
44531640(n/a)See Bill Text
44531645(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback