SC H4590 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Continued
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Continued
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Reduce The Required Degree Of Such Supervision From Direct Supervision To General Supervision.
Title
Auricular detoxification therapy
Sponsors
Rep. Raye Felder [R] | Rep. John King [D] | Rep. Brandon Newton [R] | Rep. Bruce Bryant [R] |
Rep. Thomas Pope [R] | Rep. Dennis Moss [R] | Rep. Gary Simrill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Continued |
2018-04-12 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-10-18 |
2018-04-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |