SC H4562 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of United States Highway 178 In Orangeburg County From Milepost 39.229 At The Northern Bowman Town Limit To Milepost 40.603 "arthur J. Glover Memorial Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway Containing These Words.
Title
Arthur J. Glover Memorial Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-16 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2019-05-09 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-05-08 | House | Introduced |