SC H4555 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "parental Bill Of Rights" By Adding Chapter 23 To Title 63 So As To Provide Necessary Findings And Definitions, To Prohibit Certain Government Infringement On The Fundamental Rights Of Parents To Direct The Upbringing, Education, Health Care, And Mental Health Care Of Their Children Except In Limited Circumstances, To Reserve All Parental Rights To The Parents Of Children In This State And To Provide A Nonexhaustive List Of Such Rights, To Provide Related Requirements Concerning Public Education Institutions And Health Care Providers, To Provide Penalties For Violations, And To Make These Provisions Applicable Notwithstanding Contrary Provisions In Declared States Of Emergency; And To Amend Section 63-5-340, Relating To The Age Of Consent For Minors To Certain Health Care Services, So As To Increase The Age Of Consent To Eighteen.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parent Bill of Rights Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-12HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
2022-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2022-01-11HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-11-10HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-11-10HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0900 (Similar To) 2021-12-06 - Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
635340(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback