SC H4553 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Matthews
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Matthews
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Chapter 157 To Title 59 So As To Provide That Individualized Education Program Teams Shall Make Certain Considerations For Children Who Identify As Deaf Or Hard-of-hearing.
Title
Deaf persons' literacy rights and education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Matthews |
2022-01-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliam |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-11-10 | House | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4553&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/4553_20211110.htm |