SC H4548 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 62-24)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Act No. 231
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 62-24)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Act No. 231
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Require A Motor Vehicle Dealer Who Charges A Closing Fee To Pay A Registration Fee And The Fee Must Be Included In The Advertised Price Of The Motor Vehicle; To Define The Term Closing Fee; To Establish The Procedures A Dealer Shall Undertake Before Charging A Closing Fee And To Authorize The Department Of Consumer Affairs To Determine Whether A Closing Fee Is Reasonable; To Provide That A Dealer Who Complies With Certain Statutory Requirements May Lawfully Charge A Closing Fee, To Allow A Motor Vehicle Dealer To Assert Any Defenses Provided To A Creditor Pursuant To Title 37, And To Allow A Purchaser Injured Or Damaged By The Action Of A Motor Vehicle Dealer In Violation Of Certain Statutory Requirements May Assert The Remedies Available Pursuant To Title 37; To Authorize The Department Of Consumer Affairs To Administer And Enforce Motor Vehicle Dealer Closing Fees; And To Express The Intent Of The General Assembly
Title
Closing fees on motor vehicle sales contract
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Act No. 231 | |
2016-06-09 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2016-06-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 265 | |
2016-05-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 |
2016-05-26 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Amended |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Special order, set for May 11, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Amended |
2016-04-13 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Amended |
2016-03-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee report: Majority favorable, minority unfavorable Judiciary |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-02-25 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-02-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-02-23 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-7 |
2016-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-23 | House | Amended |
2016-02-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gagnon |
2016-02-11 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2016-02-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White, Spires, R.L.Brown, Gilliard, Dillard |
2016-02-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Alexander, Stavrinakis, Newton |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2016-02-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks, Knight, Cole, George, Horne, G.R.Smith, G.M.Smith, Williams, Limehouse, Pope, Gambrell |
2016-02-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hayes, Mack, Rivers, Ridgeway, Clary, Brannon, Atwater, Daning, Bannister, Anthony, McEachern, Mitchell, Erickson |
2016-02-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: King, Loftis |
2016-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Simrill, G.A.Brown, Bedingfield, Stringer, Ryhal |
2016-01-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ott, Govan, Riley, Willis, Thayer, Felder, Hicks |
2016-01-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine, Hamilton, Finlay, Huggins |
2016-01-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Corley |
2016-01-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pitts |
2016-01-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons, Sottile, Crosby, V.S.Moss, Jefferson, Yow, Duckworth, H.A.Crawford, Jordan, Fry, Herbkersman, Lowe, Goldfinch, Hixon, Norman, Hiott, Taylor, McCoy, D.C.Moss, Collins, Rutherford, Anderson, Kirby |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-12-10 | House | Prefiled |