SC H4537 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allow An Income Tax Credit For Contributions To A Scholarship Funding Organization That Provides Grants For Students To Attend Certain Independent Schools, To Specify The Manner In Which The Credit Is Claimed, To Specify The Process By Which Certain Organizations And Schools Become Eligible, To Specify Certain Information Which Must Be Made Public, And To Allow The Department Of Revenue To Enforce The Provisions Of The Credit.
Title
Income tax credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-03-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2016-03-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-89 Nays-0 |
2016-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-02 | House | Amended |
2016-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mitchell |
2016-02-25 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2016-02-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-02-24 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Sottile |
2016-02-24 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-25-16 |
2016-02-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Long |
2016-02-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-02-11 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2016-02-10 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Robinson-Simpson |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-12-10 | House | Prefiled |