SC H4508 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gagnon, Gambrell
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gagnon, Gambrell
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enact The "south Carolina Pastor Protection Act"; To Establish That A Refusal To Perform A Marriage Ceremony Is Not A Basis For A Cause Of Action By The State Or Political Subdivision Against A Religious Organization, An Individual Employed By A Religious Organization Or A Minister Or Other Member Of The Clergy; And To Provide That An Individual Or Organization May Not Be Required To Perform A Marriage Ceremony If It Would Cause The Organization Or Individual To Violate A Sincerely Held Religious Belief.
Title
South Carolina Pastor Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Thayer [R] | Rep. William Chumley [R] | Rep. James Burns [R] | Rep. Steve Moss [R] |
Rep. Richard Yow [R] | Rep. Craig Gagnon [R] | Sen. Michael Gambrell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gagnon, Gambrell |
2016-01-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-12-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-12-03 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4446 (Similar To) 2016-02-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gambrell, Gagnon
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4508&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4508_20151203.htm |