SC H4504 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 44-96-100, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating In Part To Penalties For Violating Waste Tire Regulations, So As To Change Certain Penalty Requirements; To Amend Section 44-96-170, Relating To The Regulation Of Waste Tires, So As To Authorize The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Promulgate Regulations And Make Certain Permitting Decisions Concerning Waste Tire Management; To Amend Section 44-96-450, Relating To Penalties For Violation Of Certain State Solid Waste Management Laws, So As To Change Certain Penalty Requirements; And For Other Purposes.
Title
Waste tire regulations
Sponsors
Rep. Sylleste Davis [R] | Rep. Joseph Daning [R] | Rep. JA Moore [D] | Rep. Krystle Matthews [D] |
Rep. Davey Hiott [R] | Rep. Cally Forrest [R] | Rep. William Hixon [R] | Rep. Randy Ligon [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2020-01-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0 |
2020-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-21 | House | Amended |
2020-01-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ligon |
2020-01-16 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon |
2020-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-04-30 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
44 | 96 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 96 | 170 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 96 | 450 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |