SC H4492 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Require The Foster Care Review Board To Advise Foster Parents About The Right To Submit A Report To And Be Heard By The Court At A Hearing Concerning The Child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notice of child abuse and neglect hearings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-15 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 89 NV: 9 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-15HouseRoll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
2016-06-15HouseConference report adopted
2016-06-01HouseConference committee appointed Putnam, McCoy, Norrell
2016-06-01SenateSenate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Shealy, Young, McElveen
2016-05-26HouseRoll call Yeas-0 Nays-89
2016-05-26HouseNon-concurrence in Senate amendment
2016-05-25 Scrivener's error corrected
2016-05-25SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2016-05-24SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2016-05-24SenateRead second time
2016-05-24SenateAmended
2016-05-24SenateCommittee Amendment Amended and Adopted
2016-05-12 Scrivener's error corrected
2016-05-11SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2016-04-20SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Young (ch), McElveen, Shealy
2016-04-20SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-04-20SenateIntroduced and read first time
2016-04-20HouseAdopted, sent to Senate
2016-04-19HouseRoll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
2016-04-19HouseRead second time
2016-04-19HouseAmended
2016-04-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Pitts
2016-04-13HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2016-03-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Finlay
2016-03-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins, Clary, Erickson, Long, Ryhal, Herbkersman, Newton, Tinkler, Jordan, Hicks, McCoy, M.S.McLeod, Douglas, Henegan, Allison, G.M.Smith, Funderburk
2016-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2015-12-03HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-12-03HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6311720(n/a)See Bill Text
6371630(n/a)See Bill Text
6371700(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4492&session=121&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4492_20151203.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4492_20160413.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4492_20160419.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4492_20160511.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4492_20160512.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4492_20160524.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4492_20160525.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=11425
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=11825
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=11906
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=12137

Bill Comments

feedback