SC H4483 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Committed to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Committed to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Change Certain Program Requirements.
Title
Physicians selected as participants in student loan repayment program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Committed to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-02-22 | House | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-02-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Howard |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2017-12-13 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4483&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4483_20171213.htm |