SC H4469 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Employees Of A Law Enforcement Agency Who Regularly Issue Parking Violation Tickets Also May Issue Handicapped Parking Violation Tickets.
Title
Uniform parking violation tickets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Parks |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2018-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pitts, D.C.Moss |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-12-13 | House | Prefiled |