SC H4452 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorate The Sixtieth Anniversary Of The Opening Of The Richard V. Woods Memorial Bridge In Downtown Beaufort, South Carolina, And To Create The Woods Bridge Study Committee To Examine The Bridge's Lifespan And Condition And To Make Recommendations On Potential Plans Or Replacement Options In Order To Best Preserve The Historic Landmark.
Title
Woods Bridge Study Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-05-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-05-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0 |
2019-05-02 | House | Read second time |
2019-05-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-30 | House | Recalled from Beaufort Delegation |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Beaufort Delegation |
2019-04-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |