SC H4410 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorize The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Assess Monetary Penalties Against Persons Operating Unlicensed Tattoo Facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tattoo Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2018-03-27SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-03-22HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2018-03-21HouseRoll call Yeas-96 Nays-0
2018-03-21HouseRead second time
2018-03-21HouseAmended
2018-03-20HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 3-21-18
2018-03-08HouseCommittee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2018-02-01HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced and read first time
2017-11-09HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2017-11-09HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
443480(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback