SC H4404 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committed to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committed to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, So As To Enact The "veterans Nursing Degree Opportunity Act"; And By Adding Article 3 To Chapter 33, Title 40 So As To Authorize The Development And Implementation Of Veteran Associate Of Science In Nursing Degree Programs And Veteran Bachelor Of Science In Nursing Degree Programs To Enable Military Veterans With Relevant Military Training And Experience To Expedite The Transition From Military Life To A Professional Career In Nursing, To Provide Necessary Definitions, To Require A Collaborative Effort By The Commission On Higher Education, State Board Of Nursing, Board For Technical And Comprehensive Education, And Division Of Veterans' Affairs To Identify Gaps Between Relevant Military Education And Training And Academic Requirements For Undergraduate Nursing Education Programs And Degrees Approved By The State Board Of Nursing And Licensure By The Board, And To Approve Curriculum To Enable Military Veterans To Apply Such Education And Training Toward Requirements For An Associate's Degree In Nursing Or A Bachelor's Degree In Nursing And Licensure As A Licensed Practical Nurse Or Registered Nurse, Among Other Things.
Title
Veterans Nursing Degree Opportunity Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Education |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-115 Nays-0 |
2020-01-22 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2020-01-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-01-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2020-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-21 | House | Amended |
2020-01-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon |
2020-01-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-04-04 | House | Introduced and read first time |