SC H4403 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 59-63-120, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Bullying Prohibition Policies Adopted By School Districts, So As To Provide Procedures For Responding To And Remediating Allegations Of Bullying, To Require An Appeals Procedure, And To Provide Certain Additional Requirements Of School Districts And The Superintendent Of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bullying

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-23SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-01-22HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2020-01-22 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-01-21HouseRoll call Yeas-109 Nays-5
2020-01-21HouseRead second time
2020-01-21HouseAmended
2020-01-16 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-01-15HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2019-04-04HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5963120(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback