SC H4384 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revise And Expand Protections Afforded By The Act, To Extend Such Protections To School Personnel, To Require School Boards To Adopt Related Policies, To Require The State Department Of Education To Develop Related Model Polices, And To Revise The Citation To The Act.
Title
Religious Viewpoints Antidescrimination Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis |
2018-02-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-11-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-11-09 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4384&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4384_20171109.htm |