SC H4343 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "south Carolina Academic Integrity Act" By Adding Article 5 To Chapter 29, Title 59 So As To Define Necessary Terms, To Provide Public School Websites Must Include Certain Information And Means Of Providing Related Feedback Concerning Instructional Materials And Curricula In Use; To Provide Related Reporting Requirements Of The State Department Of Education And School Districts; To Prohibit The Teaching, Use, Or Promotion Of The 1619 Project Or Certain Other Tenets; To Provide For The Withholding Of Funding For Noncompliance With Certain Provisions Of This Act; And To Provide Requirements For Public Schools That Seek Or Receive Federal Grants Related To History Or Social Studies Education.
Title
Academic Integrity Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White |
2021-06-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning |
2021-06-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Cox, Erickson, W.Newton, Bradley, Herbkersman |
2021-05-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McGarry, May |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-05-05 | House | Introduced and read first time |