SC H4336 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-9)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Robinson
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Robinson
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 56-1-2150, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Qualifications A Person Must Possess To Drive A Commercial Motor Vehicle, So As To Provide A Person Who Has A Commercial Driver License Is Presumed To Possess The Qualifications To Drive A Commercial Motor Vehicle.
Title
Commercial vehicle driver qualifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Robinson |
2020-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill, Gagnon |
2020-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan |
2020-01-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon |
2020-01-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest |
2020-01-22 | House | Committed to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Atkinson, Huggins, Wooten, Clemmons |
2020-01-21 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 1-22-20 |
2020-01-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ligon |
2020-01-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |