SC H4335 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Recommitted to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Regulations and Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Recommitted to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Regulations and Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "regulatory Freedom Act" By Adding Section 1-23-135 So As To Establish That A Regulation Promulgated Under The Administrative Procedures Act Expires Five Years After July 1, 2020, Or The Effective Date Of This Act, Whichever Is Later.
Title
Regulatory Freedom Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures |
2020-02-13 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2020-01-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones |
2019-05-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Fri., 5-10-19 |
2019-04-24 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: McGinnis |
2019-04-10 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-04-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill |
2019-04-10 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Kirby, Rose |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Regulations and Administrative Procedures |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |