SC H4333 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-27)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Simmons, Dillard, Hixon, Brawley, Allison, D.C.Moss, Parks, Moore
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adjust South Carolina's Individual Campaign Contribution Limits By Linking Them To The Current Federal Campaign Contribution Limit As Most Recently Indexed For Inflation By The Federal Election Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign contribution limits

Sponsors

Rep. Frank Atkinson [D]Rep. David Weeks [D]Rep. Jackie Hayes [D]Rep. Micajah Caskey [R]
Rep. Jason Elliott [R]Rep. Patricia Henegan [D]Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D]Rep. Terry Alexander [D]
Rep. John Mccravy [R]Rep. Russell Fry [R]Rep. Robert Williams [D]Rep. Brandon Newton [R]
Rep. Richard Martin [R]Rep. William Bailey [R]Rep. Timothy McGinnis [R]Rep. Linda Bennett [R]
Rep. Kevin Hardee [R]Rep. Thomas Pope [R]Rep. Cally Forrest [R]Rep. Christopher Wooten [R]
Rep. William Hewitt [R]Rep. William Whitmire [R]Rep. Wallace Jordan [R]Rep. Jimmy Bales [D]
Rep. Roger Kirby [D]Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D]Rep. Randy Ligon [R]Rep. Alan Clemmons [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Johnson [R]Rep. Bruce Bryant [R]Rep. Heather Crawford [R]Rep. Craig Gagnon [R]
Rep. Robert Ridgeway [D]Rep. Gary Simrill [R]Rep. Murrell Smith [R]Rep. Leonidas Stavrinakis [D]
Rep. Ivory Thigpen [D]Rep. James Burns [R]Rep. Roy Magnuson [R]Rep. Bruce Bannister [R]
Rep. West Cox [R]Rep. Mandy Kimmons [R]Rep. Carl Anderson [D]Rep. Neal Collins [R]
Rep. William Wheeler [D]Rep. Michael Sottile [R]Rep. William Chumley [R]Rep. Kambrell Garvin [D]
Rep. John King [D]Rep. Marvin Pendarvis [D]Rep. Justin Bamberg [D]Rep. Doug Gilliam [R]
Rep. Samuel Rivers [R]Rep. Robert Brown [D]Rep. Ronald Young [R]Rep. Steven Long [R]
Rep. Steve Moss [R]Rep. Kit Spires [R]Rep. Shannon Erickson [R]Rep. Christopher Hart [D]
Rep. Jerry Govan [D]Rep. Ashley Trantham [R]Rep. Krystle Simmons [D]Rep. Chandra Dillard [D]
Rep. William Hixon [R]Rep. Wendy Brawley [D]Rep. Merita Allison [R]Rep. Dennis Moss [R]
Rep. Anne Parks [D]Rep. JA Moore [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Simmons, Dillard, Hixon, Brawley, Allison, D.C.Moss, Parks, Moore
2019-04-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Garvin, King, Pendarvis, Bamberg, Gilliam, Rivers, Brown, Young, Long, V.S.Moss, Spires, Erickson, Hart, Govan, Trantham
2019-03-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Burns, Magnuson, Bannister, W.Cox, Kimmons, Anderson, Collins, Wheeler, Sottile, Chumley
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-27HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0800 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8131314(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback