SC H4332 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
Declare May 2023 As "nf Awareness Month" And Further To Declare May 17, 2023, As "nf Awareness Day" In The State Of South Carolina.
Title
NF Awareness Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-04-18 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |