SC H4327 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revise The Definition Of "farm Structure" For Purposes Of This Section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Building Codes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-05-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-05-07HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-05-02HouseRoll call Yeas-98 Nays-0
2019-05-02HouseRead second time
2019-05-02HouseAmended
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-03-27HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6965(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback