SC H4256 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide These Payments Must Be Kept In A Trust Account Until The Merchandise Is Delivered For Its Intended Use Or Is Delivered Into The Physical Possession Of The Purchaser.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funeral contracts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-04-24SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-24HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-23HouseRoll call Yeas-xxx Nays-xxx
2019-04-23HouseRead second time
2019-04-23HouseAmended
2019-04-03HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2019-04-02HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 4-3-19
2019-03-26HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-03-19HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
327100(n/a)See Bill Text
327110(n/a)See Bill Text
328360(n/a)See Bill Text
328385(n/a)See Bill Text
401910(n/a)See Bill Text
4019110(n/a)See Bill Text
4019115(n/a)See Bill Text
401920(n/a)See Bill Text
4019200(n/a)See Bill Text
4019250(n/a)See Bill Text
4019290(n/a)See Bill Text
4019295(n/a)See Bill Text
401930(n/a)See Bill Text
401970(n/a)See Bill Text
401980(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback