SC H4241 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 107
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 107
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Act 907 Of 1962, As Amended, Relating To The Georgetown County School District And The Georgetown County Board Of Education, So As To, Among Other Things, Conform Local Election Procedures For Members Of The Board Of Education To The Controlling 2008 Consent Judgment And Decree; To Define Relevant Terms; To Provide That The Georgetown County School District Must Be Governed By A Board Of Education Consisting Of Nine Members Who Must Be Elected In Nonpartisan Elections Conducted At The Same Time As The General Election And Every Four Years Thereafter, Except As Provided In This Act To Stagger The Members' Terms; To Provide That When A Vacancy Occurs In Office, By Reason Of Death, Resignation, Or Removal, The Vacancy In Office Shall Be Filled By A Special Election For The Remainder Of The Unexpired Term; To Provide That Persons Desiring To Qualify As A Candidate For The Georgetown County Board Of Education Shall File Written Notice Of Candidacy With The Georgetown County Board Of Voter Registration And Elections; To Establish The Applicable Candidate Filing Period; To Provide That The Georgetown County Board Of Voter Registration And Elections Shall Conduct And Supervise The Elections For Members Of The Georgetown County Board Of Education In The Manner Governed By The Election Laws Of This State, Mutatis Mutandis; And To Repeal Act 237 Of 1983 Relating To Board Vacancies. - Ratified Title
Title
Georgetown County School District - Board Elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 42) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Act No. 107 | |
2021-06-01 | Effective date 05/19/21 | |
2021-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-05-18 | Ratified R 107 | |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-04-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-78 Nays-0 |
2021-04-28 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-04-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-0 |
2021-04-27 | House | Read second time |
2021-04-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-04-22 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Georgetown Delegation |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to Georgetown Delegation |
2021-04-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |