SC H4235 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]

Summary

Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Bridge Located On Highway 1 Approximately Four Miles Outside The Town Of Mcbee "sergeant Darryl Quick Memorial Bridge" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing This Designation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sergeant Darryl Quick Memorial Bridge

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateAdopted, returned to House with concurrence
2019-04-11SenateRecalled from Committee on Transportation
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-04-03SenateIntroduced
2019-04-03HouseAdopted, sent to Senate
2019-03-28HouseCommittee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
2019-03-13HouseIntroduced

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback