SC H4221 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 7-5-120, Relating To Qualifications For Registration And Disqualifications From Registering Or Voting, So As To, Among Other Things, Allow Persons On Probation, Parole, Or Other Offender Supervision Programs To Register And Vote; And By Amending Section 7-15-320, Relating To Persons Qualified To Vote By Absentee Ballot, So As To Add Persons Incarcerated Who Register To Vote After Successful Completion Of A Course Requirement.
Title
Parolee voting
Sponsors
Rep. Marvin Pendarvis [D] | Rep. Bill Taylor [R] | Rep. William Hixon [R] | Rep. Robert Williams [D] |
Rep. Wendell Gilliard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard |
2024-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Williams |
2023-04-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor, Hixon |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-29 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4221&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/4221_20230329.htm |