SC H4187 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 6-11-273, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Tax Levy Referendums, So As To Provide That Referendums Conducted Pursuant To This Section Must Be Scheduled To Be Held At The Same Time As The General Election.
Title
Local Government - Tax Levy Referendum
Sponsors
Rep. West Cox [R] | Rep. Jonathon Hill [R] | Rep. John West [R] | Rep. Craig Gagnon [R] |
Rep. Anne Thayer [R] | Rep. Brian White [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-23 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2021-04-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2021-04-22 | House | Read second time |
2021-04-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2021-04-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White |
2021-04-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill, West, Gagnon, Thayer |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |