SC H4169 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 55-5)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Memorialize The Congress Of The United States To Approve The United States-mexico-canada Agreement (usmca) In Order To Ensure Continuity In Trade Among The Three North American Economic Partners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

US-Mexico-Canada Agreement (USMCA)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseAdopted
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
2019-03-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: West
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback