SC H4152 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That Post-use Polymers And Recoverable Feedstocks Used In Pyrolysis And Gasification Processes Are "recovered Materials" And Are Not "solid Waste" For The Purposes Of Regulation By The Department Of Health And Environmental Control.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid waste policy and management

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 13 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2019-04-30SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-30HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-26 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-25HouseRoll call Yeas-63 Nays-27
2019-04-25HouseRead second time
2019-04-25HouseAmended
2019-04-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton
2019-04-24HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 4-25-19
2019-04-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, R.Williams, Clyburn, Cobb-Hunter, Henegan
2019-04-04HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2019-04-04HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest, Magnuson, Chumley, Burns, Long, Elliott
2019-04-02HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 4-3-19
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-12HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0574 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
449640(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback