SC H4143 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Act No. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Act No. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revise The House Of Representatives Districts Constituting The Districts Which Comprise House District Residency Seats On The Board From Which Six Members Of The Board Must Be Appointed, And To Further Provide For The Nominating Process In Regard To The Selection Of Certain Members Of The Board
Title
Greenville Health System Board of Trustees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 54) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 54) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-17 | Act No. 102 | |
2015-06-08 | Effective date 06/03/15 | |
2015-06-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-05-28 | Ratified R 78 | |
2015-05-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0 |
2015-05-27 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2015-05-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-08 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-05-07 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2015-05-07 | House | Roll call Yeas-67 Nays-0 |
2015-05-07 | House | Read second time |
2015-05-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis |
2015-05-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |