SC H4141 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Act No. 159
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Act No. 159
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide A Citation, To Define Necessary Terms, To Provide Requirements Only Under Which Travel Retailers May Offer And Disseminate Travel Insurance Under A Limited Lines Travel Insurance Producer Business Entity License For Compensation, To Provide That Travel Insurance May Be Provided Under An Individual Policy Or Under A Group Or Master Policy, To Provide That Limited Lines Travel Insurance Producers Acting As An Insurance Designee Are Responsible For The Acts Of The Travel Retailer And Shall Use Reasonable Means To Ensure Compliance By The Travel Retailer With This Article, And To Provide Penalties For Violations
Title
Limited Lines Travel Insurance Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Act No. 159 | |
2016-04-27 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2016-04-21 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-04-19 | Ratified R 164 | |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-1 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-02-11 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2016-02-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-11 | House | Amended |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-05-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |