SC H4125 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-20 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-20 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Erect A Sign In Richland County On The Corner Of Gervais Street Where It Intersects With Mcduffie Street In The City Of Columbia's Lyons Street Neighborhood Containing The Words "in Memory Of Marvin Heller Longtime Lyon Street Neighborhood President And Community Activist".
Title
Marvin Heller Memorial Intersection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-05-06 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced |