SC H4122 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation - Panel For Dietetics, Relating To Licensure By Registration; And Licensure By Endorsement, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4851, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Licensure by registration and licensure by endorsement (D. No. 4851)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2019-03-06 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S0456 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry