SC H4119 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Renal Dialysis Facilities May Deliver Legend Drugs Or Devices To Patients In Certain Circumstances, To Define Necessary Terms, And To Provide These Provisions Do Not Waive Other Necessary Credentialing Requirements For Individuals And Facilities.
Title
Renal dialysis facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0 |
2017-04-19 | House | Read second time |
2017-04-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |