SC H4075 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Repealing Section 1-7-730 Relating To The Examination Of The Offices Of County Officers.
Title
Examination of the offices of county officers
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Johnson [R] | Rep. Edward Tallon [R] | Rep. William Hixon [R] | Rep. Thomas Pope [R] |
Rep. Kevin Hardee [R] | Rep. Max Hyde [R] | Rep. William Hewitt [R] | Rep. Robert Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0 |
2019-04-10 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-09 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-10-19 |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2019-04-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams |
2019-02-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope, Hardee, Hyde, Hewitt |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced and read first time |