SC H4034 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of Bunker Hill Road In The Town Of Little Rock From Its Intersection With West Main Street To Its Intersection With Harllees Bridge Road "maxie Rowell Road" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Road That Contain The Words "maxie Rowell Road".
Title
Maxie Rowell Road
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence | |
2011-04-27 | Recalled from Committee on Transportation | |
2011-04-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-04-14 | Introduced | |
2011-04-14 | Adopted, sent to Senate | |
2011-04-13 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-04-06 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-04-06 | Introduced |