SC H4023 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Act No. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Act No. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 59-152-60, Relating To Local First Steps Partnership Boards, So As To Revise The Composition, Manner Of Appointment, And Terms Of Membership Of The Boards, To Provide For The Termination Of Certain Current Board Members, And To Provide For The Transition Of The Performance Of Certain Tasks By Local First Steps Partnerships; By Amending Section 59-152-70, Relating To Local Partnership Boards, So As To Include Provisions Concerning The Administration Of Local Partnerships, And To Provide For The Establishment Of Multicounty Partnerships; By Amending Section 59-152-150, Relating To Development And Adoption Of A Standard Fiscal Accountability System For Local Partnerships, So As To Revise Provisions Concerning Polices And Procedures For The Procurement Of Goods And Services; By Adding Section 63-11-1726 So As To Provide All Publicly Funded Early Childhood-serving Agencies And Entities Shall Participate In Certain Data Sharing Initiatives Supported By The Advisory Council; By Amending Section 63-11-1720, Relating To The First Steps Board Of Trustees, So As To Add The Director Of The Department Of Mental Health As A Trustee; By Amending Section 63-11-1725, Relating To The First Steps Advisory Council, So As To Revise Membership Of The Advisory Council, To Revise Data Governance Policies, To Provide For Certain Activities To Build Parent Knowledge, And To Require The Development, Implementation, And Review Of An Overall Strategic Plan; By Amending Section 63-11-1730, Relating To Oversight Duties Of The First Steps Board Of Trustees, So As To Include Provisions Concerning Local Partnership Personnel Policies; And By Amending Section 59-152-10, Relating To The Establishment Of South Carolina First Steps To School Readiness, So As To Clarify That The Provisions Of The Authorizing Act Are Permanent And Future Reauthorizations Are Not Required. - Ratified Title
Title
First Steps
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 111 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 111 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Act No. 81 | |
2023-06-26 | Effective date 06/19/23 | |
2023-06-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2023-06-14 | Ratified R 100 | |
2023-06-14 | House | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2023-06-14 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2023-06-14 | House | Conference report received and adopted |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0 |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Conference report received and adopted |
2023-05-11 | House | Conference committee appointed Erickson, S Jones, Tedder |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Scott, Hembree, Turner |
2023-05-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-111 |
2023-05-11 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-04-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-31 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2023-03-30 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2023-03-30 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0 |
2023-03-30 | House | Read second time |
2023-03-30 | House | Amended |
2023-03-29 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2023-03-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2023-02-23 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 152 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 152 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 152 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 152 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 11 | 1720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 11 | 1725 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 11 | 1726 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 11 | 1730 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |