SC H4017 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 87
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 87
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-6-40, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Application Of The Internal Revenue Code To State Income Tax Laws, So As To Update The Reference To The Internal Revenue Code To The Year 2020, To Provide That If The Internal Revenue Code Sections Adopted By This State Are Extended, Then These Sections Also Are Extended For South Carolina Income Tax Purposes, And To Provide For The Tax Treatment Of The Paycheck Protection Program And Certain Expenses As Provided For In The Federal Consolidated Appropriations Act Of 2021; To Specifically Not Adopt Certain Provisions Of The Coronavirus Aid, Relief, And Economic Security Act; And To Adopt A Provision Of The American Rescue Plan Relating To Unemployment Compensation, And To Authorize Funds To Account For The Adopted Provision. - Ratified Title
Title
IRS code
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Simrill [R] | Rep. Thomas Pope [R] | Rep. David Weeks [D] | Rep. West Cox [R] |
Rep. Jonathon Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Act No. 87 | |
2021-06-01 | Effective date 05/18/21 | |
2021-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-05-18 | Ratified R 106 | |
2021-05-13 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0 |
2021-05-13 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-05-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2021-04-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-08 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0 |
2021-04-07 | House | Read second time |
2021-04-07 | House | Amended |
2021-04-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2021-04-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks, W.Cox |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H5057 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Act No. 201